THE CHARLIE HARRISON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing funding to local maternity services in order to improve access to training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
Governance
- 25 April 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK JAMES HARRISON | Chair | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIP JACKSON BLAND MBE | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|||||||
CLAIRE VICTORIA HARRISON | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29 | £25 | £0 | £8 | £12 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £570 | £96 | £72 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/2012
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO THE IMPROVED DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF MATERNITY AND EARLY LIFE CARE, PARTICULARLY NEO-NATAL CARE 2.SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Beeston Drive
Knutsford
WA16 9BN
- Phone:
- 01565651508
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window