FRIENDS OF SELWYN SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Selwyn School is formed of parents, carers, and staff, who are actively organising fun events for the children, with a focus on fundraising initiatives for the school. Our mission is to boost the schools internal community by hosting events that are engaging with parents and children alike, to create a friendly environment and support Selwyn Primary in their future fundraising goals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 25 January 2012: Standard registration
- FOSS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Loren Glover | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Knifton-Harrison | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Rebecca Lucas | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Bunting | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Saunders | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Erbes | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Irving | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.25k | £19 | £22.92k | £22.85k | £26.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.55k | £1.38k | £8.91k | £13.46k | £19.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/01/2012 as amended on 27 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of Selwyn School
Selwyn Primary School
Selwyn Avenue
London
E4 9NE
- Phone:
- 02085273814
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window