REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD FRUITFUL LAND TILBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian Religion and the relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Thurrock
Governance
- 25 January 2012: Standard registration
- RCCG FRUITFUL LAND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR TUNDE OGEDENGBE | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|||||
OLUWOLE OBAFEMI OGUNLEYE | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|||||
OKIRORO SCOTT ODEJE | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/10/2011
Charitable objects
2.2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLD-WIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE 2,2,2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTYY
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 The Beeches
Tilbury
RM18 8ED
- Phone:
- 01375406175
- Email:
- info@rccgfruitfulland.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window