Financial history ZEBRA ACCESS CIO

Charity number: 1149181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £126.76k £187.23k £213.13k £207.28k £344.55k
Total expenditure £126.19k £134.27k £234.19k £190.69k £276.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £250 £3.50k £3.25k