ZEBRA ACCESS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Develop opportunities for Deaf people by providing support, education, advice and access to training, technology, services, facilities and workshops to improve their life skills, health choices, activities and careers Support and develop strong Deaf community ethos and advocating wider social cohesion Educate and inform Deaf people of their basic human rights Lead/manage Film and Arts festivals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £3,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 October 2012: Standard registration
- ZEBRA ACCESS LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARILYN WILLRICH | Chair | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Wendi Brickliffe | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Diane Rhodes | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Vann | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iona Fletcher | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN SALTER | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SEBASTIANA MAZZOCCHIO | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA CLARE BEECH | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.76k | £187.23k | £213.13k | £207.28k | £344.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.19k | £134.27k | £234.19k | £190.69k | £276.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £250 | £3.50k | £3.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 June 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 June 2023 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 12 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
3. OBJECT[S] THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO [IS][ARE] “TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN THE DEAF COMMUNITY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR DEAFNESS, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) DEVELOP OPPORTUNITIES FOR DEAF PEOPLE TO HAVE BETTER CHANCES IN LIFE BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO TRAINING AND WORKSHOPS TO IMPROVE THEIR LIFE SKILLS. B) ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND PROVIDE EMPLOYMENT FOR DEAF PEOPLE THROUGH PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND ADVICE. C) SUPPORT AND PROMOTE STRONG COMMUNITY ETHOS BY ENCOURAGING DEAF PEOPLE TO BECOME MORE ACTIVE WITHIN THEIR COMMUNITIES AND WORK TOGETHER TO TACKLE COMMON PROBLEMS AS WELL AS ADVOCATE WIDER SOCIAL COHESION. D) RAISE AWARENESS AND IMPROVE ACCESSIBILITY TO TECHNOLOGY, SERVICES AND FACILITIES SO DEAF PEOPLE CAN ENJOY, UNDERSTAND AND DEVELOP THEMSELVES FURTHER. E) PROMOTE AND ADVOCATE HEALTHIER LIFESTYLES BY RAISING AND IMPROVING AWARENESS OF AVAILABLE ACTIVITIES AND HEALTH CHOICES F) LEAD AND MANAGE FILM AND ARTS FESTIVALS WHICH ALLOW DEAF PERFORMERS, COMMUNITIES AND DIRECTORS TO SHOWCASE THEIR TALENTS TO A WIDER AUDIENCE. G) EDUCATE AND INFORM DEAF PEOPLE OF BASIC HUMAN RIGHTS AS CITIZENS REGARDLESS OF THEIR AGE, DISABILITY, GENDER, MARRIAGE/CIVIL PARTNERSHIP, PREGNANCY/MATERNITY, SEXUALITY, RELIGION AND RACE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
ZEBRA ACCESS CIO
Creative Industries Centre
Wolverhampton Science Park
Glaisher Drive
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV10 9TG
- Phone:
- 01902711688
- Email:
- carol@zebra-access.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window