CRACKERJACKS CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Crackerjacks provide specialist equipment and respite breaks to disabled children throughout the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 2012: Standard registration
- CRACKERJACKS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Hopkins | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Arnold | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paulina Lipiec | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK DEARDEN | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAY CARTWRIGHT | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.33k | £183.89k | £222.55k | £242.06k | £322.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.56k | £99.48k | £182.84k | £259.78k | £295.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £72.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN DIAGNOSED AND SUFFERING FROM A SEVERE DISABILITY, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24A Worcester Street
KIDDERMINSTER
Worcestershire
DY10 1ED
- Phone:
- 03001240122
- Email:
- info@crackerjacks.org.uk
- Website:
-
crackerjacks.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window