HOPE FOR THE NATIONS MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION RELIEVING OF POVERTY ADVICE AND COUNSELLING HELPING OTHER CHARITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 09 March 2012: Standard registration
- 05 February 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.30k | £21.64k | £38.10k | £56.70k | £57.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.50k | £21.36k | £31.82k | £49.44k | £60.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | 13 March 2019 | 529 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2016
(These accounts |
13 March 2019 | 529 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 NOV 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYS OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ( BUT NOT LIMITED TO) UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY:- (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTS KINGDOM BY SPREADING THE GOSPEL THROUGH THE PRINTED MEDIA, RADIO, TV, SATELLITE, INTERNET AND SIMILAR MEDIA. (2) THE RELIEF OF NEED BY PROVISION OF FOOD AND OTHER HELPFUL MATERIALS TO THE NEEDY DURING OUR FELLOWSHIPS AND ACTIVITIES (3) OFFERING PASTORAL CARE AND SUPPORT TO THOSE IN NEED OF SUCH THROUGH PRAYERS AND COUNSELLING. (4) THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIANS WHO ARE ENGAGED FULL-TIME IN THE MISSIONARY WORK OF PROCLAIMING THE GOSPEL AND IN BRINGING OTHERS TO BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST AND TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH HIS TEACHING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window