MERSEY YOUTH SUPPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with people that face particular barriers to conventional employment. We help them take responsibility for their own future and help them explore the possibility of self employment. They will be able to test their business idea and we will help them ensure they have funding in place. We will offer them their own office space. We then provide timely, relevant and on-site mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 08 May 2012: Standard registration
- MYST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON JAMES WALKER | Chair | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Tracy-Forster | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephanie Wright | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Corless | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR MAXWELL STODDART | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.06k | £69.53k | £109.28k | £46.83k | £54.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.48k | £59.41k | £63.81k | £68.84k | £78.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £33.52k | £4.16k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2023 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2023 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/05/2012
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS, IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY FOR PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED AND HELP IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS. 2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o T4 Consulting
The Mount
Woodlands Road
Liverpool
L17 0AN
- Phone:
- 0151 314 1518
- Email:
- hugh@t4consulting.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window