PLAY ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Play England is the national children's play charity for England. Play England works to support better play opportunities for children and young people throughout England, based on the child's right to play set out in in Article 31 of the UN Convention on the Rights of the Child.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 December 2012: Standard registration
- 13 June 2024: Funds received from 1181998 CHURCHILL KIDS CLUB
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anita Rose Grant | Chair | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Archie Morrell | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Dodd | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Cocker | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Panash Shah | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Wilson | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61k | £2.78k | £10.00k | £11.12k | £2.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.44k | £4.10k | £11.24k | £14.00k | £16.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/11/2012 as amended on 05 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS, BEING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ENGLAND, ARE: 4(1) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) IN PARTICULAR A CHILD’S RIGHT TO PLAY AS A FUNDAMENTAL HUMAN RIGHT (ARTICLE 31 OF THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD); 4(2) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR IMPAIRMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; 4(3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR IMPAIRMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 4(4) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH QUALITY PLAY OPPORTUNITIES, AND THROUGH DEVELOPING AND SUPPORTING HIGH QUALITY AND ACCESSIBLE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND QUALIFICATIONS FOR ALL PEOPLE WITH AN INTEREST IN THE PROVISION OF CHILDREN’S PLAY SERVICES; 4(5) TO PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITIES AND NON CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADMINISTRATIVE AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR ORGANISATIONS SUPPORTING PLAY OPPORTUNITIES AND PROVISION.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Linden Accountants Ltd
Scrapstore House
21 Sevier Street
BRISTOL
BS2 9LB
- Phone:
- 07958 427293
- Email:
- info@playengland.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window