FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S C OF E (AIDED) PRIMARY SCHOOL (PULBOROUGH)

Charity Number: 1147547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

FUNDRAISING FOR RESOURCES TO ENHANCE THE LEARNING ENVIRONMENT OF THE CHILDREN OF ST MARY'S COE (AIDED) PRIMARY SCHOOL PULBOROUGH

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £28,112
Total expenditure: £36,565

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 May 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Raylene Barnes Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Katherine Williams Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Aloma Louise Seal Trustee 11 February 2020
None on record
Sam Copus Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record
Annie Lewis Trustee 05 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £23.79k £11.08k £12.02k £18.82k £28.11k
Total expenditure £16.66k £21.93k £7.65k £16.07k £36.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £500 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys C of E Primary School
Link Lane
PULBOROUGH
RH20 2AN
Phone:
01798872007