BIKE SAFE, WEST OXFORDSHIRE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1146947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bike Safe promote and encourage cycling, walking and low energy transport within Oxfordshire. We promote the development and provision of safe routes, paths and facilities and seek to influence the policies of government to support these aims. Our current priority project is the development of a multipurpose community path between villages alongside the B4044.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £954
Total expenditure: £4,876

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 April 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BIKE SAFE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN LEGGETT Chair 27 January 2012
None on record
Michael Chippendale Trustee 04 September 2023
None on record
Professor Christine Collin Trustee 16 November 2018
None on record
JOHN RODOLPH BLACKIE Trustee 26 September 2014
None on record
JOHN EDMUND GRIFFIN Trustee 27 January 2012
THE OXFORDSHIRE BUILDINGS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.28k £1.24k £1.12k £2.90k £954
Total expenditure £9.56k £6.00k £16.07k £23.51k £4.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 MAYFIELD ROAD
FARMOOR
OXFORD
OX2 9NR
Phone:
01865862614