THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BICESTER EMMANUEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved.Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 March 2012: Previously excepted registration
- EMMANUEL PCC, BICESTER (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev IAN ROWLAND BISCOE | Chair | 31 January 2012 |
|
|||||
Ksenija Jackson | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bargrove | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Williams | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen McNally | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Moore | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hall | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Winson | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher Hunt | Trustee | 03 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Lesley Clark | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne Walton | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Winson | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Croxford | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annie Croxford | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter George Hill | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jolly | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Rosemary Winson | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev ERIKA BISCOE | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIM HOWARD | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV CAROL HILL | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.04k | £180.79k | £203.25k | £192.32k | £209.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.94k | £193.49k | £198.25k | £218.37k | £216.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.65k | £9.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 01 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OFFICE
2 BARBERRY PLACE
BICESTER
OXFORSHIRE
OX26 3HA
- Phone:
- 01869320021
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window