BLYTH WILDLIFE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RESCUE AND REHABILITATION OF SICK AND INJURED WILDLIFE ACROSS NORTHUMBERLAND AND NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 16 April 2012: Standard registration
- NOTHUMBRIA WILDLIFE RESCUE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ANDERSON | Chair | 28 February 2012 |
|
|||||
Sharon Denise Davies | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah New | Trustee | 08 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Leightley | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
VICKY ANDERSON | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.11k | £56.71k | £63.39k | £38.59k | £101.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.26k | £41.71k | £65.63k | £50.76k | £70.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
16 January 2025 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 December 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 December 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/03/2012
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY THOSE FROM THE WILD IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO RESCUE AND SUPPLY VETERINARY CARE TO ANIMALS RESCUED WITH THE AIM TO RAISE AND CARE FOR SUCH ANIMALS UNTIL THEY CAN COPE WITH LIFE THEN TO RELEASE THEM TO THEIR NATURAL HABITAT OR SUITABLE HOME 2. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE 3. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Hallington Mews
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 6UE
- Phone:
- 0330 229 1710
- Email:
- info@b-w-r.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window