Accounts and annual returns THE QUEEN ELIZABETH DIAMOND JUBILEE TRUST

Charity number: 1145640
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 30 June 2020 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 10 December 2019 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2018 17 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 17 December 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 05 April 2018 On Time