Financial history THE QUEEN ELIZABETH DIAMOND JUBILEE TRUST

Charity number: 1145640
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £8.47m £3.97m £4.30m £99.87k £37.76k
Total expenditure £12.58m £17.74m £17.55m £16.13m £4.87m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.97m £2.30m £4.00m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £81.76k £3.84m £4.17m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £2.05k £1.07k £3.47k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £8.16m £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £228.80k £135.46k £128.29k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.55m £17.73m £17.54m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.89k £7.54k £6.62k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £66.77k £113.37k £100.73k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.96m £16.19m £15.98m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A