THE QUEEN ELIZABETH DIAMOND JUBILEE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to enrich the lives of people from all backgrounds within the Commonwealth, and our programmes will work in alliance towards eliminating avoidable blindness and to empower a new generation of young leaders. With a five-year timeframe to deliver successful programmes, the Trust?s aim is to leave a lasting legacy, owned by the whole Commonwealth, to honour Her Majesty The Queen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belize
- Botswana
- Brunei
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cyprus
- Dominica
- Eswatini
- Fiji
- Ghana
- Grenada
- Guyana
- India
- Jamaica
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Lesotho
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Malta
- Mauritius
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Rwanda
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Solomon Islands
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Tanzania
- The Bahamas
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Vanuatu
- Zambia
Governance
- 26 January 2012: Standard registration
- 22 April 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.47m | £3.97m | £4.30m | £99.87k | £37.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.58m | £17.74m | £17.55m | £16.13m | £4.87m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.97m | £2.30m | £4.00m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £81.76k | £3.84m | £4.17m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.05k | £1.07k | £3.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.16m | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £228.80k | £135.46k | £128.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £12.55m | £17.73m | £17.54m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £20.89k | £7.54k | £6.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £66.77k | £113.37k | £100.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £10.96m | £16.19m | £15.98m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 17 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 17 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 23 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 05 April 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY (IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION) DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window