ALEX GROSE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have continued to encourage and acknowledge young people in pushing their personal boundaries to achieve their potential, resulting in awards to pupils at Ashby School, Ashby (Hastings) Scout Group and Endurance Explorers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 22 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ALEXANDER GROSE BSC MSC | Chair | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Chris Grose | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS JAN BROWN | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER ANNE GROSE BA HONS | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162 | £133 | £64 | £71 | £64 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.10k | £2.22k | £209 | £555 | £143 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 NOV 2010
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION AN/OR THE PERSONAL SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 19 YEARS WHO SHALL BE EITHER PUPILS OF ASHBY SCHOOL NOTTINGHAM ROAD ASHBY-DE-LA-ZOUCH LEICESTERSHIRE OR MEMBERS OF A SCOUT GROUP OR EXPLORER UNIT BEING PART OF ASHBY & COALVILLE DISTRICT AND TO FURTHER THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THESE OBJECTS BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS OF INDIVIDUALS OR TO ESTABLISHED ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT; THE MAKING OR PERIODIC AWARDS TO MEMBERS OF SCOUT GROUPS OR EXPLORER UNITS BEING PART OF ASHBY & COALVILLE DISTRICT OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Tamworth Road
Ashby-de-la-Zouch
LE65 2PW
- Phone:
- 01530413856
- Email:
- dag144@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window