AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In England: promoting education, training, employability, befriending, social cohesion, recreational, culture, art and sports schemes, as well as the relief of poverty schemes. In Africa: Support for education and training, farming and agriculture, human rights, health, social care, environmental and relief of poverty projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £350 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cameroon
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ivory Coast
- Togo
Governance
- 14 February 2012: Standard registration
- 23 September 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 September 2016: Funds transferred to 1169279 AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY SUPPORT
- AFSCS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.35k | £35.35k | £23.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.18k | £21.18k | £23.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £350 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 05 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 30 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 30 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 03 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 03 July 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 DEC 2010
Charitable objects
OBJECTS THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PEOPLE OF AFRICAN ETHNIC ORIGIN WHOSE FIRST LANGUAGE IS FRENCH AND WHO ARE RESIDING IN AFRICA OR IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF SUFFICIENT. THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF FRENCH SPEAKING AFRICA SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE WHO LIVE IN FRENCH SPEAKING AFRICAN COUNTRIES, OR WHO HAVE BEEN DISPLACED FROM FRENCH SPEAKING AREAS OF AFRICA BY NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE BY THE SUPPLY AID TO SUCH PERSONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window