ST JAMES' INFANT AND JUNIOR SCHOOLS PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St James C of E Primary School PTA supports the school by enabling and delivering activities and events for the children to enjoy and to raise money for the school. Activities range from second hand uniform sales to the summer fair. The money raised is given to the school to purchase materials and equipment, and to make improvements to the school site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Kent
Governance
- 25 May 2012: Standard registration
- ST JAMES' PTA (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lydia Lee | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hanes | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jack George Gibbs | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Oakley | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.60k | £21.65k | £11.68k | £30.00k | £29.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.69k | £1.98k | £5.60k | £11.92k | £59.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 August 2020 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 August 2020 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: -DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; -ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JAMES'S JUNIOR & INFANT SCHOOL
SANDROCK ROAD
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
KENT
TN2 3PR
- Phone:
- 01892522301
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window