RADWINTER VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Radwinter Village Hall Charity exists to provide Radwinter with a good village hall that is well used and an asset to the community; when surplus funds allow the Charity aims to support other worthy causes in the parish for the benefit of the residents of Radwinter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 03 February 2012: Standard registration
- RVHC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE BRIGHT | Chair | 31 January 2012 |
|
|||||
David Gordon Richardson | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Eileen Mary Duck | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN HOWARD KENNETH GRAVES BSC | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
WENDY JANE ROWLEY | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE CLARE SHOOLHEIFER | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DAVID CAMP FCA | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.68k | £31.48k | £33.03k | £24.06k | £25.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.52k | £16.89k | £28.55k | £19.53k | £17.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.96k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 02/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/04/2014
Charitable objects
OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (1) THE PRIMARY OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, AND TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. THERE IS A RESTRICTION TO THE ABOVE IN THAT THE TRUSTEES HAVE TO ALLOW THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL TO HAVE FIRST RIGHT OF USE OF THE VILLAGE HALL ON SUNDAYS AND OTHER HOLY DAYS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FREE OF RENT (BUT SUBJECT TO PAYMENT OF COSTS). (2) THE SECOND OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO APPLY MONIES, INSOFAR AS THEY ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES SURPLUS TO THE REQUIREMENTS OF THE PRIMARY OBJECTIVE, TO OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (3) THE THIRD OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECTS SPECIFIED IN SUB-CLAUSES (1) AND (2) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT IN THE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE ALMSHOUSES. TO FACILITATE THE OBJECTS, THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS RADWINTER VILLAGE HALL DESCRIBED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE APPROPRIATED AND USED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jarrards
Church Hill
Radwinter
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB10 2SX
- Phone:
- 01799599900
- Email:
- webmaster@radwinter.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window