HORSEED EAST AFRICA DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping women , children and displace people in East Africa , we are currently building a orphanage center in Burao, Somaliland , to accommodate 100 Orphans from 0 to 1 8 years of age and skill training centre for displace somali people ,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Kenya
- Somalia
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 29 June 2012: Standard registration
- 18 August 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.17k | £1.00k | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.85k | £400 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/2012
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN EAST AFRICA BY: (1) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF POVERTY, INFLUENCE POLICY AND CAMPAIGN FOR RIGHTS OF THE VULNERABLE IN SOCIETY; (2) HELPING TO RAISE FUNDS, TRAIN AND BUILD THE CAPACITY OF SMALL NGOS WORKING WITH THE YOUTH AND OTHER VULNERABLE GROUPS; (3) OFFERING STREET CHILDREN SHELTER, FOOD, MEDICAL CARE, EDUCATION, PROTECTION, GUIDANCE, RESPECT AND LOVE; (4) RAISING AWARENESS AND PROVIDE AN ALTERNATIVE TO TRAFFICKING YOUTHS (TAHRIIB) WHICH REMAINS ONE OF THE MOST SERIOUS AND URGENT CHALLENGES FOR THE YOUTHS OF EAST AFRICA; (5) EMPOWERING YOUNG PEOPLE TO CHANGE LIVES FOR GOOD THROUGH TRAINING, EDUCATION AND BUSINESS START-UPS; (6) PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR DISPLACED PEOPLE IN EAST AFRICA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window