CHERRYBROOK JFC

Charity number: 1146046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To run a children's football club

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL COTTER Chair 27 January 2012
None on record
LORRAINE COTTER Trustee 27 January 2012
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 12 January 2025 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 03 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 17 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Cherrybrook Drive
Winstanley
Wigan
WN3 6LB
Phone:
01942221316
Email:
No information available