FRIENDS OF IBBA GIRLS SCHOOL, SOUTH SUDAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The UK charity supports and funds a school for girls in Ibba, South Sudan. The school opened to its first intake of 40 girls in 2014. Each year about 40 more girls have joined, so that the school is now full with 360 girls in 2023. The school employs 40 people as teachers, matrons, cooks, cleaners, etc. The charity continues to raise funds to finance school buildings and operating costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Sudan
Governance
- 02 March 2012: Standard registration
- 17 January 2023: Funds received from 702516 THE WOOLHOPE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John Trott | Chair | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kristine Atong Malok | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Harding | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Justin Nyieer Gordon Muortat | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dame Rosalind Marsden | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|||||
JULIA SANDERS | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JEAN FRASER HARTLEY | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Paget | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £431.51k | £488.14k | £478.31k | £352.69k | £242.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £369.51k | £253.73k | £479.45k | £435.63k | £435.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 DEC 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT - 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT FOR THE BUILDING, ESTABLISHMENT AND RUNNING OF A GIRLS SCHOOL IN IBBA, SOUTH SUDAN TO PROVIDE HIGH QUALITY EDUCATION ROOTED IN CHRISTIAN VALUES; 3.2 TO PROVIDE FUNDING AND SUCH OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT TO ENABLE ACCESS FOR CHILDREN OF ALL FAITHS (AND NONE) WHATEVER THEIR BACKGROUND, STATUS OR FINANCES; 3.3 TO PROVIDE FUNDING FOR RESIDENTIAL FACILITIES SO THAT THE SCHOOL MAY SERVE THE NEEDS NOT ONLY OF IBBA VILLAGE AND IBBA COUNTY BUT WESTERN EQUATORIA STATE AS WELL; AND 3.4 TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 STYVECHALE AVENUE
COVENTRY
CV5 6DW
- Phone:
- 02476715655
- Email:
- connect@friendsofibba.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window