MANCHESTER YOUTH THEATRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 15 February 1974: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DECEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED 2 SEPTEMBER 1996 AND 15 JULY 1998 AS AMENDED 19 JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PERSONS,THAT IS TO SAY PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BETWEEN THE AGES OF 14 AND 21, THROUGH THE MEDUIM OF THE DRAMA, MUSIC AND THE SPOKEN WORD AND THROUGH AN UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE BRITISH DRAMATIC HERITAGE..
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window