Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF YSGOL PEN COCH

Charity number: 1147880
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
Annual return 04 April 2023 24 June 2024 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2022 03 July 2023 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2021 03 October 2022 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2020 10 April 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required