Financial history FRIENDS OF YSGOL PEN COCH

Charity number: 1147880
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2019 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023
Total gross income £1.93k £4.34k £515 £60 £1.50k
Total expenditure £5.02k £5.14k £70 £200 £385
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A