FRIENDS OF YSGOL PEN COCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Ysgol Pen Coch helps to raise funds to provide equipment and resources for the children attending the school (items that the LEA does not fund) i.e. Soundbeam, Special Play equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Flintshire
Governance
- 29 June 2012: Standard registration
- FOYPC (Working name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie Sarah Hornby | Chair | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amy Ruth Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Georgina Megan Hughes | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Briony Harper | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Anne Louise Marzal | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leah Lester | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Galloway | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Jones | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2019 | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.93k | £4.34k | £515 | £60 | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.02k | £5.14k | £70 | £200 | £385 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 10 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT YSGOL PEN COCH SPECIALIST PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 King Edward Drive
FLINT
Clwyd
CH6 5QD
- Phone:
- 07969812520
- Email:
- marie.hornby@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window