Accounts and annual returns CLIFTON BREAKFAST CLUB LTD

Charity Number: 1146137
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2015 10 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2014 16 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 16 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2013 02 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 02 February 2014 On Time