THE HADRIAN'S WALL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilitate all aspects of managing the World Heritage Site for the benefit of local & regional communities, working with partners & stakeholders to protect the archaeology, conserve the landscape that surrounds it, promote understanding & access.Realise the potential of the WHS to contribute to the social & economic benefit of local & regional communities through sustainable tourism development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2014
Total income:
£1,450,259
Donations and legacies | £348.02k | |
Charitable activities | £1.01m | |
Other trading activities | £93.33k | |
Investments | £621 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,777,026
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.68m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £95.03k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.68m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 09 February 2012: Standard registration
- 31 January 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 31 January 2017: Funds transferred to 513055 Cultura Trust
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 30/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.78m | £1.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.22m | £1.78m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £660.34k | £348.02k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £61.28k | £93.33k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.06m | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.22k | £621 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.18m | £1.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £47.28k | £95.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2013 | 30/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £649.19k | £184.02k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £214.53k | £76.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 14 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | 14 April 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 28 May 2014 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 02 April 2014 | 61 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2011
Charitable objects
4. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF HADRIAN'S WALLS, ITS SIGNIFICANCE AND ANY RELATED SUBJECT; 4.2 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF HADRIAN'S WALL AND SURROUNDING REGIONS; 4.3 TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HADRIAN'S WALL AND ITS ENVIRONMENT FOR FUTURE GENERATIONS; AND 4.4 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 4.4.1 THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; AND 4.4.2 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION WITHIN THE AREA OF HADRIAN'S WALL AND SURROUNDING AREAS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ARTICLE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEED OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATION TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS; AND 4.5 THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN AREAS SURROUNDING HADRIAN'S WALL BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 4.5.1 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 4.5.2 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED; AND 4.5.3 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window