Accounts and annual returns HOUSE OF COMFORT CHURCH

Charity number: 1146200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required