THE QUARRY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1147766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust 's interests are currently centred on education and sport. Projects that encourage greater access to high quality education or to sport are of interest as are those supporting people with special educational needs especially those involving disadvantaged children. The Trustees are not currently entertaining any unsolicited applications. All available funds are now fully committed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £82
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GARETH QUARRY Chair 10 February 2012
None on record
HUGO QUARRY Trustee 02 March 2017
None on record
LOVEDAY QUARRY Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
BEN QUARRY Trustee 25 December 2012
None on record
JILL WHITEHOUSE Trustee 10 February 2012
None on record
OLIVER QUARRY Trustee 10 February 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £22 £9 £2 £29 £82
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 20 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 February 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 March 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Montrose House
186 Petersham Road
Richmond
TW10 7AD
Phone:
02089402362