COR DATHLU CWMTAWE MALE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Choir exists to educate the Public in the art and science of choral music and to maintain the strong traditional art of Welsh Male Voice Choral Singing. In execution of this aim the choir provides it's services in fund raising concerts for various charitable organisations throughout the UK and Overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN GEORGE | Chair | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL EVANS | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
CONWAY ADRIAN MORGAN | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
David Colin Stroud F.C.C.A. | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.82k | £9.75k | £2.46k | £7.04k | £8.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.46k | £1.35k | £7.21k | £9.25k | £7.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MALE CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND BY ANY MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 WERN ROAD
YSTALYFERA
SWANSEA
SA9 2LY
- Phone:
- 01639843166
- Email:
- COLIN@KNOCKON.CO.UK
- Website:
-
cordathlucwmtawe.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window