THE JULIE COWANS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Julie Cowans was a brilliant senior advisor on housing and planning who died from cancer in April 2011. The Julie Cowans Memorial Trust was established by her family and friends to commemorate her life and work in housing. The Trust provide grants and bursaries each year to disadvantaged young people aged between 16-24 living in the UK to help improve their life chances and personal development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID COWANS | Chair | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jane Barker | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
GARY BREWERTON | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 07 April 2025 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 07 April 2025 | 494 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT (THE "OBJECTS").
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Rawcliffe Lane
York
YO30 6NP
- Phone:
- 07775535155
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window