PROPS NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROPS North East provides care and support for the Families and Carers of Substance Misusers within North Tyneside and the City of Newcastle upon Tyne. The support provided includes: Complimentary Therapies; Advocacy; Group and One to One Support; Respite Care; Councelling; Training, and Respite in our own caravan
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 26 March 2012: Standard registration
- 18 January 2013: Funds received from 1093053 NEWCASTLE P.R.O.P.S.
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Dodd | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Broadhead | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Griffin | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Mitchell | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Denise Wilkins | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rosemary Sinton | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.50k | £342.43k | £374.47k | £416.95k | £458.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £344.22k | £294.64k | £355.85k | £379.27k | £391.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £252.00k | £267.37k | N/A | £387.33k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF THOSE DEPENDENT ON DRUGS AND/OR ALCOHOL, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION AND TRAINING, AND OTHER CHARITABLE FORMS OF SUPPORT, AND BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO DRUG AND ALCOHOL DEPENDENCE, AND THEIR ASSOCIATED BEHAVIOURS, WITH THE OVERALL AIM BEING TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE FAMILY RECOVERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Linskill & North Tyneside Community
Development
Linskill Centre
Linskill Terrace
NORTH SHIELDS
NE30 2AY
- Phone:
- 01912263440
- Email:
- office@propsnortheast.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window