'SPECTRUM WASP'

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer a comprehensive schedule of structured events and activities, including residential breaks, cinema outings, arts and craft sessions, family day trips, music therapy sessions, wall climbing, biking, cooking, swimming, trampolining etc. This helps to develop confidence, coordination, interaction, life and learning skills for Children/Young People on the Autistic Spectrum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £76,259 from 1 government contract(s) and £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 29 March 2012: Standard registration
- 28 November 2018: Funds received from 515981 ASHFIELD AND MANSFIELD YOUTH PROJECTS CHARITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Savage | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Dickinson | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Wightman | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Richmond | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|||||
HEATHER JOHNSTONE | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA MELLORS | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
BECKY HERWARD | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JUDI RADFORD | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.55k | £157.33k | £141.11k | £253.96k | £300.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.14k | £114.25k | £127.76k | £183.03k | £245.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £48.03k | £53.75k | £46.28k | £66.35k | £76.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k | N/A | N/A | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2012 as amended on 19 May 2021
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS ON THE AUTISTIC SPECTRUM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spectrum W A S P
Ransom Hall
Southwell Road West
Rainworth
MANSFIELD
NG21 0HJ
- Phone:
- 07746185394
- Email:
- info@spectrumwasp.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window