Financial history VALLEY END CRICKET CLUB

Charity number: 1145954
Charity reporting is up to date (127 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £265.52k £180.11k £254.49k £271.50k £256.18k
Total expenditure £144.38k £148.41k £282.84k £277.44k £287.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.80k £27.72k £6.17k £500