VALLEY END CRICKET CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and facilitate community participation in healthy recreation in particular the playing of cricket and the provision of high quality coaching and playing facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 February 2012: Standard registration
- VECC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew George Monk | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Debra Barr | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Barr | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ray Neil Ferris | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Kerr | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES PETER GERALD YOUNG | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.52k | £180.11k | £254.49k | £271.50k | £256.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.38k | £148.41k | £282.84k | £277.44k | £287.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.80k | £27.72k | £6.17k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 March 2025 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 March 2025 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 January 2023 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 January 2023 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 December 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 December 2021 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 January 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 January 2021 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HIGH QUALITY COACHING AND PLAYING FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Valley End Cricket Club
Windlesham Road
Chobham
Woking
GU24 8SN
- Phone:
- 01276856505
- Email:
- valleyendcc@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
valleyend.play-cricket.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window