Trustees VALLEY END CRICKET CLUB
Charity number: 1145954

Charity reporting is up to date (127 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew George Monk | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Debra Barr | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Barr | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ray Neil Ferris | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Kerr | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES PETER GERALD YOUNG | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.