THE WRIGHT HASSALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make grants to charities chosen by the trustees of the Charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Salma Hameed | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Julia Sankey | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Shrimpton | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kate Cottey | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bailey Caitlin Jordan | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Rhind | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Janet Robinson | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.18k | £7.41k | £5.12k | £2.31k | £1.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.66k | £7.63k | £3.45k | £1.06k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
TO MAKE GRANTS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WRIGHT HASSALL
OLYMPUS AVENUE
TACHBROOK PARK
WARWICK
CV34 6BF
- Phone:
- 01926886688
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window