FRIENDS OF THE CHAMBO SEMINARY, ECUADOR

Charity Number: 1146894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance education of, and relieve the poverty of young men from the native Puruha tribe and the mestizo peasants of Chimborazo province of Riobamba, Ecuador.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £9,853

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Colombia
  • Ecuador

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CANON ALAN FINLEY Chair 15 February 2012
None on record
Dr Andrew Franklin Wareham Trustee 25 May 2018
None on record
Dr Juan Mario Diaz Arevalo Trustee 03 November 2017
None on record
ELISABETH WAREHAM Trustee 20 September 2012
None on record
Rev MICHAEL HEALY Trustee 15 February 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.25k £600 £507 £502 £0
Total expenditure £16.27k £14.65k £16.99k £9.34k £9.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 PARK GATE
MOUNT AVENUE
LONDON
W5 1PX
Phone:
02088106889
Website:

No information available