PHOENIX BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED

Charity number: 1147645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support Herefordshire children and young people between the ages of 5 and 21 (25 for vulnerable adults), who experience the death of someone close to them. We enable families, carers, volunteers and professionals to provide support for bereaved children. We advocate in the best interests of bereaved children, young people and their families.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £27,513
Total expenditure: £44,476

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 June 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • PHOENIX BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LINDA JONES Chair 24 May 2012
None on record
Jessica Faye Bellis Trustee 18 January 2019
None on record
Lorraine Smith Trustee 12 January 2018
None on record
Ronnette Angela Thomas Trustee 12 January 2018
None on record
LEONA PATTERSON Trustee 24 May 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.69k £64.83k £58.05k £69.42k £27.51k
Total expenditure £37.79k £42.58k £60.52k £56.68k £44.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE FRED BULMER CENTRE
WALL STREET
HEREFORD
HR4 9HP
Phone:
01432264555