Faith in Schools

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is for every child and young person in schools to have the opportunity to meet, in their RE lessons, local Christians and discover what it means to be a Christian in the 21st century.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £14,688 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
184 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Liverpool City
- Wirral
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 June 2012: Standard registration
- FIS (Working name)
- FAITH IN SCHOOLS NEWHAM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK THOMAS WATERFIELD BA, PGCE | Chair | 22 April 2012 |
|
|||||
Susanne Daswani | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|||||
JILL MCWILLIAM | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.16k | £155.85k | £177.62k | £152.79k | £120.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.13k | £146.75k | £169.15k | £145.78k | £121.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £56.06k | £22.00k | £14.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25/05/2012 as amended on 21 Sep 2021 as amended on 11 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THEIR SCHOOLS AND IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE CHURCH IN AREAS OF SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 REGINALD ROAD
LONDON
E7 9HS
- Phone:
- 02082211627
- Email:
- rachel@faithinschools.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window