Financial history RCCG CITY OF FAITH

Charity Number: 1148819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £36.50k £24.69k £37.55k £34.36k £35.16k
Total expenditure £17.41k £14.74k £21.84k £33.55k £45.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A