EMMAUS CORNWALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Affording sheltered occupation and accommodation to the formerly homeless within Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income includes £16,464 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 27 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Leslie Tatam | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||
Pamela Gladys Page | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|||||||
Michael Heap | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Michelle James | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Joanne Tatam | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.01k | £9.67k | £29.35k | £44.13k | £21.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £9.63k | £27.44k | £10.24k | £15.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £16.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE ALLEVIATION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM, IN CONFORMANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE EMMAUS MOVEMENT AS PUBLISHED FROM TIME TO TIME BY EMMAUS UK, TO THOSE IN NEED WITHOUT DISTINCTION BY: 3.1 THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, OR ASSISTANCE IN SUCH PROVISION, FOR HOMELESS PEOPLE IN THE [ ] AREA AND SUCH OTHER PLACES AS MAY SEEM APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME (THE BENEFICIARIES). 3.2 THE REHABILITATION OF THE BENEFICIARIES AS APPROPRIATE AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, EMPLOYMENT TRAINING) AND WORK OPPORTUNITIES AND SATISFACTION FOR THE BENEFICIARIES WITH THE PURPOSE OF DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT IN THE FUTURE AND THEREBY DEVELOP A SENSE OF SELF WORTH AND DIGNITY THROUGH HAVING A SELF-SUPPORTING LIFE. 3.3 THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF OTHER EMMAUS COMMUNITIES AND GROUPS OR OTHER AGENCIES IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HOMELESSNESS WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE EXCHANGE OF RESOURCES, INFORMATION AND EXPERTISE WITH OTHER EMMAUS PROJECTS WORLD WIDE. 3.4 THE FULFILLING OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS BEING CHARITABLE AND WHICH THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Valletort Terrace
Wilton Road
PLYMOUTH
PL1 5PT
- Phone:
- 07973 462509
- Email:
- meico@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
emmaus.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window