RCCG TREASURE HOUSE OF GOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is for the advancement of Christian faith for the benefit of the public. Rccg Treasure House of God preaches the gospel of Jesus Christ every Sunday at the church Premises. Activities include but not limited to prayer learning about the gospel and developing the congregations knowledge in Jesus Christ, Provision of Pastoral care for people & Missionary outreach
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 13 June 2012: Standard registration
- TREASURE HOUSE OF GOD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GBOLAHAN AJAI | Trustee | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA OBI | Trustee | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.98k | £63.17k | £50.18k | £55.48k | £58.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.29k | £59.00k | £65.33k | £56.59k | £60.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2024
(These accounts |
22 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/02/2013
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GADEBRIDGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
THE NOAKS
GALLEY HILL
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HERTFORDSHIRE
HP1 3LG
- Phone:
- 07879101287
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window