Trustees CANTEMUS AT CALDAY
Charity Number: 1149707

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Smith | Chair | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
John-Paul Simpson Mr | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Isobel Bodenes Mrs | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Manning | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Norton | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annette Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Osborne | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Roberts | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Lowe | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.