MASJID ABU BAKR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MASJID ABU BAKR IS PLACE OF WORSHIP, IT OFFERS FAMILY EDUCATIONAL CLASSES, MARRIAGE SERVICES AND BEREAVEMENT COUNSELLING AND LEGAL ADVICE. THE MASJID STANDS AS A PILLAR WITHIN THE COMMUNITY AND HELPS CONNECT DIVERSE GROUPS OF PEOPLE AND IS AN ACTIVE PARTICIPANT WITHIN ALL FAITH COMMUNITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 February 2012: Standard registration
- 15 February 2012: Funds received from 1108594 THE ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE AND MASJID ABU BAKR (...
- 15 February 2012: Funds received from 1041212 HIGHAM HILL MOSQUE TRUST
- 17 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1190878 MASJID ABU BAKR WALTHAMSTOW
- 17 January 2025: Removed (Amalgamated)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.09k | £389.84k | £239.32k | £303.71k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.82k | £222.48k | £198.46k | £233.27k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.36k | £3.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 January 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 25 January 2022 | 56 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window