BLOOD BIKES NICU SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance health or save lives by providing a volunteer motorcycle and car transport service and ancillary to transport provided by the statutory authorities. For the transfer of blood, blood products and breast milk for premature or very ill babies, people and other medical resources between donors, hospitals and medical facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 04 April 2012: Standard registration
- BLOODBIKES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Thomas | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Way | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
KENNY ROBERTSON | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA BIRD | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MIKE BURNS | Trustee | 27 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL NEWMAN | Trustee | 21 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.83k | £31.29k | £35.25k | £32.58k | £40.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.08k | £22.28k | £21.47k | £34.29k | £32.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 March 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE HEALTH OR SAVE LIVES BY PROVIDING A VOLUNTEER MOTORCYCLE AND CAR TRANSPORT SERVICE ANCILLARY TO TRANSPORT PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, FOR THE TRANSFER OF BLOOD, BLOOD PRODUCTS, HUMAN BREAST MILK FOR PREMATURE OR VERY ILL BABIES, PEOPLE, AND OTHER MEDICAL RESOURCES BETWEEN DONORS, HOSPITALS, AND MEDICAL FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR FARM
CHURCH ROAD
NORTON MALREWARD
PENSFORD
BRISTOL
BS39 4EX
- Phone:
- 07831470870
- Email:
- bloodbikes@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window