Trustees PARADISE RIDA SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1155025
Charity reporting is up to date (282 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nizam Patel Chair 31 August 2017
None on record
Afsana Patel Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Yusuf Patel Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Yunus Gajra Trustee 01 May 2022
INDIAN MUSLIM PATEL SOCIETY
Received: 153 days late
Ayub Mitha Trustee 16 December 2013
None on record
HABIB KHATIB Trustee 07 August 2013
TALK DIRECT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
YASIR PATEL Trustee 21 May 2012
CENTRAL MOSQUE ROCHDALE
Received: On time
ELYAS ESSAP AHMED DALAL Trustee 21 May 2012
None on record