St Francis Malawi Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work in Malawi continues, we support three schools in Lilongwe. We take children to Bunda Health Clinic for consultation, treatment and medicines. We provided funds,clothes and medical supplies for Kasina Clinic. Feeding and food growing programmes are in place with the schools.Teaching support via our pupils continues. We are now registered for gift aid donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
- Malawi
Governance
- 01 August 2012: Standard registration
- CARDINAL WISEMAN MALAWI TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEAN FRANCIS O'DONOVAN MBE JP BSc | Chair | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Kenward | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dettmer | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARY NOELLE MIDDLETON | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 July 2023 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/07/2012 as amended on 08 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP DIRECTED AT THE POOREST CHILDREN LIVING IN MALAWI.
Area of benefit
MALAWI
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brook House
Meretown
NEWPORT
Shropshire
TF10 8BX
- Phone:
- 01952811993
- Email:
- sodonovanmbe@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window